Ghuman v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kulveer K. Ghuman
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv01443
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AFTER 14 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 11/27/2017. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER 11 to Continue Settlement Conference and Discovery Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2017. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 1/8/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghuman v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulveer K. Ghuman
Represented By: Bjorn Burlin
Represented By: Dane Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?