Pruitt v. Key Energy Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Pruitt
Defendant: Key Energy Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01457
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Directing the Clerk to CLOSE the Action Based Upon the Parties' Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall appear for deposition on October 5, 2017 at a time and place to be noticed by Defendant; The parties may file a stipulation should they agree to have Plaintiffs deposition occur on a different date prior to the discovery deadline; and Failure to appear in compliance with this order will result in the issuance of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/27/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 5/12/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 3/3/2017; Non-Expert 10/16/2017; Expert 12/22/2017. Mid Discovery Status Conference set for 7/31/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/9/2018; Hearing by 2/6/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/20/2018; Hearing by 4/3/2018. Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 6/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 9 Stipulation to Extend Deadline and Hearing Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/2017. Joint scheduling report due by 2/6/2017. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 2/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Telephonic appearances via CourtCall are authorized. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Key Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pruitt
Represented By: George P. Moschopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?