Thompson v. Big Lots Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Junique Thompson
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01464
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Directing the Clerk to CLOSE the Action Based Upon the Parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/14/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AFTER 18 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 7/14/2017. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and DENYING as MOOT Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 11 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/13/17. (Hellings, J)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/5/2017. Consent/Decline Deadline 1/17/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 5/26/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 2/17/2017; Non-Expert 10/6/2017; Expert 12/22/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/12/2018; Hearing by 2/9/2018. Dispositive Motion De adlines: Filed by 3/2/2018; Hearing by 4/17/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 7/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Big Lots Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junique Thompson
Represented By: Hugo Ernesto Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Represented By: Liana Rose Hollingsworth, PHV
Represented By: Mark A. Knueve, PHV
Represented By: Donald G. Slezak, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?