Barrera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Barrera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01466
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re Stipulation for Award of Attorney's Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) (ECF No. 27 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/20/2018. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney fees in the amount of SEVEN THOUSAND DOLLARS ($7,000.00) as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412 are awarded subject to the terms of the stipulation. (Valdez, E)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Part Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal and Remanding for Further Administrative Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/19/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before August 2, 2017; Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before September 1, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before September 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve his confidential letter brief on or before April 28, 2017, and all other dates in the scheduling order are extended accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Barrera
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Bolin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?