Doe v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: County of Kern and George Anderson
Case Number: 1:2016cv01469
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DISMISSING THE ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/13/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER AFTER 140 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/23/2020. Stipulated dismissal due by 9/11/2020. (Hall, S)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER SETTING Trial and Pretrial Conference Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/25/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' COST BILLS 108 110 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/23/2018. Defendant Anderson's costs taxed in the amount of $14,713.89 and added to his judgment. Defendants' County/Appleton costs taxed in the amount of $9,400.30 and added to their judgment. (Hall, S)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2018. (Hall, S)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Discharging the Order to Show Cause; ORDER Directing Judgment to be Entered in Favor of the Defendants and Against the Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/29/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION and ORDER 80 Regarding Submissions Containing Allegedly Confidential Information, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/20/2017. (Hall, S)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Update the Docket to Reflect Plaintiff's True Name re 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2017. (Hall, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 49 Defendant's Motion for the Disclosure of Plaintiff's True Name, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/11/2017. (Hall, S)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 54 Stipulation re Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/6/2017. (Hall, S)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 40 Motion to Modify Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2017. (Hall, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Case Schedule and to Allow the Filing of a First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2017. Amended complaint due within 3 days. (Hall, S)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Stipulation for taking the deposition of Selena Deleon, and Order thereon [F.R.C.P. Rule 30(a)(2)(b)], signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/58/2017. (Rosales, O)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER 27 for Taking the Deposition of Selena DeLeon, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/18/2017. (Hall, S)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 18 Plaintiff's Motion to File a First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2017. (Hall, S)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation Regarding Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/8/2017. (Hall, S)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/10/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 1/18/2017; Non-Expert 9/12/2017; Expert 10/17/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/16/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/24/2017; Hearing by 11/21/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/7/2017; Hearing by 12/8/2017. Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS), Fresno, before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: David K. Cohn
Represented By: Thomas Carter Seabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?