Lateef v. City of Madera et al
Plaintiff: Junaid Lateef
Defendant: City of Madera, Madera City Council and Madera Planning Commission
Case Number: 1:2016cv01488
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii),signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/21/2020. CASE CLOSED, 52 (Martin-Gill, S)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to stay the case, document 28 , pending resolution of a related case, Case No. MCV 072672 in Madera County Superior Court. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/22/2017. (Rooney, M)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/28/17. New Case Number: 1:16-cv-01488-SKO.(Marrujo, C)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/2017. (This matter is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting in Part Defendants' 5 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/13/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lateef v. City of Madera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junaid Lateef
Represented By: Brian C. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madera
Represented By: Gregory Lee Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera City Council
Represented By: Gregory Lee Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera Planning Commission
Represented By: Gregory Lee Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?