Integon Preferred Insurance v. Camacho, et al.
Plaintiff: Integon Preferred Insurance Company
Defendant: Isabella Alvarez Camacho, X-Treme Ag Labor, Inc., Enrique Franco, Cesar Neri, Selene Cati Silva, Amairani Cati Silva, Victor Cati, The Estate of Maria Candelaria Silva-Perez, Antonia Navarro-Sandoval, James Keif, Jessica Hilda Bautista Vasquez, Estevan Dalton Bautista, Jasmine Roxanne Dalton, The Estate of Christina Bautista Dalton, Jessica Bolanos, Joshua Palacios and Robert D. Dalton
Case Number: 1:2016cv01496
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/02/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING MOTION TO STAY, 102 . Valley Garlic's motion to stay under Landis is GRANTED. Valley Garlic's motion to stay under Brillhart, Colorado River, and California's abstention doctrines is DENIED. This lawsuit is STAYED until March 22, 2019. Valley Garlic and Integon shall FILE a joint status report concerning the status of the state lawsuit by April 1, 2019. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/18/2018`. (Timken, A)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER following informal teleconference; vacating all pending dates and matters set in the June 16, 2017 Scheduling Order and setting a deadline to file a motion to stay signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/2018. (Motion due by 8/17/2018. Attorney Riley C. Walter terminated from action). (Lundstrom, T)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING 92 Plaintff's Motion to Amend the Complaint and Vacating April 4, 2018 Hearing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a third amended complaint is GRANTED; The hearing set for April 4, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 is HEREBY ORDERED VACATED; and Plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint within five days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DISCHARGING February 14, 2018 and February 21, 2018 Orders to Show Cause; Vacating March 7, 2018 Hearing; and Lifting Stay Imposed as to Defendants Isabella Alvarez Camacho and X-Treme Ag Labor, Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/18. (Marrujo, C)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Requiring Gerardo Hernandez Jr. and Riley C. Walter to SHOW CAUSE for Their Failure to Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/18. Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2018. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Marrujo, C)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT X-TREME AG LABOR, INC. TO SHOW CAUSE WHY STAY SHOULD NOT BE LIFTED AND DEFENDANT CAMACHO TO NOTIFY COURT OF STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY ACTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT within five (5) days from the date of entry of this order: De fendant X-Treme Ag Labor, Inc. shall show cause in writing why the stay in this action as to X-Treme Ag Labor Inc. should not be lifted and proceedings be reinstated in this matter; and Defendant Isabella Alvarez Camacho shall inform the Court of the status of her bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/14/2018. (Hernandez, M)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Staying all Proceedings in this Matter Against Defendants Isabella Alvarez Camacho and X-Treme Ag Labor, Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/15/2017. (Flores, E)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER on Request for Entry of Default 50 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/16/17. (Hellings, J)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Service by Publication re 41 , 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Supplemental Briefing re Attempts to Serve Defendants Enrique Franco, Victor Cati Individually and as Representative of the Estate of Maria Candelaria Silva-Perez signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2017. Briefing due by 5/15/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Service by Publication without prejudice 39 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/23/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Status Report on Service of Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/07/2017. (5-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 12/22/2016 to 3/21/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2016. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integon Preferred Insurance v. Camacho, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integon Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Allan Dollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Alvarez Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X-Treme Ag Labor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Cati Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amairani Cati Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Cati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Maria Candelaria Silva-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia Navarro-Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Keif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hilda Bautista Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estevan Dalton Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Roxanne Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Christina Bautista Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Bolanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?