Machuca v. County of Kern, et al.
Plaintiff: Jorge Machuca
Defendant: County of Kern, City of Maricopa and Kern County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2016cv01497
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Mariposa
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING the Action without Prejudice for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/17.CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to Appear Through Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/2017. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2017. (Hall, S)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/6/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 18 the Motion of Attorney Mgdesyan and His Firm to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/10/2017. (Hall, S)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to PLAINTIFF to SHOW CAUSE Why the Matter Should Not Be Dismissed for His Failure to Prosecute this Action and to Comply With the Court Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/29/2016. Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 3/6/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machuca v. County of Kern, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Machuca
Represented By: George Gevork Mgdesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Maricopa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?