Torres v. Gipson et al
Plaintiff: Juan Matias Torres
Defendant: Connie Gipson, L. Clausell, D. Case, A. Mayo, T. Galaviz, K. Matta, L. Williams, J. C. Smith, D. Babineaux-Prince and C. Henderson
Case Number: 1:2016cv01525
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition; And ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/16/2020. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING 92 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2020. (Rivera, O)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 110 Motion to File a Sur-Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/24/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER LIFTING Stay; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Settlement Conference; ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 87 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order; and AMENDED Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/21/19. (Marrujo, C)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Adopting 81 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Defendants' 64 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/12/19. Matter Referred Back to Magistrate Judge. (Gonzalez, R)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 64 be DENIED for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies; ORDER GRANTING 65 , 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER DENYING 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Resolution of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/12/2019. (14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's 76 Motion for Extension of Time and Granting Defendants' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and Stay Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/14/2019. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference would be Beneficial signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/2018. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2018. (Flores, E)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/20/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING 26 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, this action shall proceed only on Plaintiffs claims for First Amendment retaliation against Defendants Smith, Prince, Henderson, Mayo, Galaviz, and Weaver, all other claims and Defendants are DISMISSED; ORDER GRANTING 45 Motion for Extension; Case to Remain Open, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Adopting 34 Findings and Recommendation Dismissing Defendant L. Williams Pursuant to FRCP 4(m), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/25/18. L. Williams (Classification Staff Representative) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' Partial 26 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/16/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 5/3/2018.(Flores, E)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 32 Motion Requesting a Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/09/2018. (Flores, E)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant L. Williams be Dismissed From This Action Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 4(m) re 16 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/1/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Certain Defendant should not be Dismissed; Show Cause Response due within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/7/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DIRECTING United States Marshals Service to Re-Attempt Service on Defendant L. Williams Without Prepayment of Costs and to Contact CDCR for Assistance in Attempting to Execute Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/5/17. (Marrujo, C)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Request for Update and Case Inquiry and Request for Extension of Time; Order Discharging Order to Show Cause 9 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE re Address Change signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/18/2017. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Matias Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Clausell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Galaviz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Babineaux-Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?