Martin Ware v. Pfeiffer et al

Plaintiff: Martin Ware
Defendant: Christian Pfeiffer, A. Pineda, A. Manasrah, K. Brown, J.E. Sai and Ruslan Lozovoy
Case Number: 1:2016cv01531
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to Comply With a Court Order and Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/28/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 18, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with a Court Order and Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief; Show Cause Response due within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 16, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISREGARDING Amended Complaint and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File Amended Complaint in Case No. 1:16-cv-01302-DAD-SAB signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/2017. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Ware v. Pfeiffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Manasrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E. Sai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruslan Lozovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?