Williams v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Williams
Defendant: Baker, Paul Copenhaver, Borja and Snyder
Case Number: 1:2016cv01540
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ADOPTING 146 Findings and Recommendations in Full signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/27/2024. (Flores, E)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DISCHARGING 156 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Directing Production of Inmate Shannon Williams, BOP #13947-047; ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/21/2024. (Sant Agata, S)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to produce Inmate, Shannon Williams, 13947-047 via Zoom Video Conference on 4/11/2024 at 1:00 p.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/14/2024. (Lundstrom, T)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Parameters and Scheduling Pre-Conference Telephone Discussion signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch- Kuchta on 01/24/2024. Settlement Statements due: March 21, 2024; Pre- Settlement Conference set for 3/27/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Settlement Conference set for 4/11/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.(Flores, E)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant 138 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re 99 signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/6/2023. Referred to Judge de Alba. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Xiong, J.)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING 141 Motion for Substitute Counsel or to Proceed Pro Se, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/03/2023. (Maldonado, C)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING 134 Amended Stipulated Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 04/13/2023. (Flores, E)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 FINAL AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 03/9/2023. (Plaintiff and Defendant disclose expert report: 5/8/2023, Discovery due by 5/15/2023, Dispositive Motions filed by 7/7/2023, Expert Rebuttal Deadline: 5/22/2023, Expert Discovery: 06/12/2023,Deadline to advise the Court of settlement: 06/16/2023,Deadline for Joint Pretrial Statement: 12/08/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba, Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba)(Martin-Gill, S)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 APPROVED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 1/23/2023. (Sant Agata, S)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING without prejudice Stipulated Protective Order 124 signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 12/8/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING 122 Motion to Modify Deadlines to Case Management and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/8/2022. Final Status Conference Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Barch-Kuchta Report Due: 03/09/2023 C onference:03/23/2023 1:00 p.m.; Deadline for completing discovery 03/15/2023; Deadline for plaintiff to disclose expert report(s) 04/07/2023; Deadline for defendants to disclose expert report(s) 04/07/2023; Deadline for disclosing any expert rebuttal report(s) 04/14/2023; Expert discovery deadline. 05/05/2023; Deadline to advise the Court of settlement, ADR, VDRP or mediation efforts to date 03/09/2023; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 06/29/2023; Deadline for filing the final joint pret rial statement, motion(s) in limine, proposed jury instructions, and verdict form 12/08/2023; Date of the final pretrial conference Before Judge de Alba at 1:30 p.m. 01/08/2024; Month and year of the trial term. Before Judge de Alba at 8:30 a.m. 03/12/2024. (Marrujo, C)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING 119 Motion to Amend Deadlines to Case Management and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 07/14/2022. Status Conference set for 11/16/2022 at 01:30 PM in Yosemite (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta.(Flores, E)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING 117 Motion to Amend Deadlines to Case Management and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/8/2022. (Marrujo, C)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 109 Request to Amend Deadlines to Case Management and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 01/12/2022. Status Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Maldonado, C)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting Request to adopt revised deadlines and resetting certain deadlines 102 signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 9/16/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING 92 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 08/24/2021. (Maldonado, C)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 06/29/2021. ( Discovery due by 1/17/2022, Dispositive Motions filed by 3/3/2022, Motions filed by 8/5/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2021 at 01:20 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, Status Conference set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta)(Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 04/05/2021.(Flores, E)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/14/2020 setting Telephonic Hearing for 6/25/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Lundstrom, T)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 72 Request for an Extension signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/11/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER VACATING 56 Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/19/2020. (Rivera, O)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER APPOINTING Limited-Purpose Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/2/2020. (Marrujo, C)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER on Recruitment of Counsel 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/7/2020. (Orozco, A)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failures to Prosecute and to Comply With Court Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/2/19. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER to Submit Briefing, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/14/2019. (Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 45 Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Excessive Force Claim signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/25/2019. (Jessen, A)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court Deny Defendant's 45 Motion for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's Excessive Force Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/25/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/15/2019. (Flores, E)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Requiring Defendant Baker to Submit Video File signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/6/2019. (Jessen, A)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendant's 45 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/31/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 2/19/2019.(Flores, E)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Extending Discovery Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER GRANTING 30 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/25/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF DATES, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/6/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/27/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/29/2017. (Flores, E)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for Action to Proceed Only on Cognizable Claims and that all other Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED; This action will proceed ONLY against Defendant Baker, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/05/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Offie to Assign Matter to a District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That This Action Proceed Only on Cognizable First and Eighth Amendment Claim and That All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, s igned by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/28/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. The new case number is 1:16-cv-01540-DAD-MJS (PC). (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Copenhaver
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borja
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?