Cato v. Lopez et al

Plaintiff: James Cato, Jr.
Defendant: D. Lopez, M. Alcala and J. Perez
Case Number: 1:2016cv01557
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2017. Settlement Conference set for 3/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Case stayed; Case Management Deadline: 5/21/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 24, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants from this action; matter is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/21/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 18, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Certain Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED From this Action re 9 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cato v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cato, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Alcala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?