Baston v. Yett, et al.

Plaintiff: Elgan Baston
Defendant: Edward M. Yett, D. Curry, Kristofer R. Campbell, Michael A. Toscano, Benjamin Arreguin and Eddie Ohaya
Case Number: 1:2016cv01564
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to close case signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/1/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Bar Transfer signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Bar Transfer be Denied; Objections, if any, Due within 21 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/18/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS That Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Be Denied 18 , 31 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/22/2017. (Hellings, J)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RESERVING RULING on and DIRECTING Response to Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Bar Transfer; ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion Requesting Courts Waive Requirement to Serve Separate Copy of Court Filings upon Defendants; Response to be Filed within 14 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/4/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/31/2017. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baston v. Yett, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elgan Baston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Yett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristofer R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Toscano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Arreguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Ohaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?