Thomas v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sharron Thomas
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda GMBH and Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Case Number: 1:2016cv01566
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the District of New Jersey. MDL No. 2789. (Robles, S)
July 26, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Motion for a Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Resolution of the Motion to Transfer signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/25/2017. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference for 7/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/22/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 19, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting in Part Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited's Motion to Dismiss 12 ; ORDER Lifting Stay of Proceedings, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/18/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 10, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint 9 Motion for a Stay Pending the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's Resolution of the Motion to Transfer signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/10/2017. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Thomas
Represented By: Melinda Davis Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?