Milan-Rodriguez v. Lynch
Petitioner: Jorge Antonio Milan-Rodriguez
Respondent: Loretta E. Lynch
Case Number: 1:2016cv01578
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Relating and Reassigning Cases signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/23/2018. (Flores, E)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Respondent's 24 Motion to Dismiss and Deny the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Amend Caption signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/12/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/15/2018.(Flores, E)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Discharging 30 Order to Show Cause; ORDER Granting Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/8/17. Supplemental Brief Deadline: 9/20/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER for Respondent to SHOW CAUSE Why Motion to Dismiss Should Not Be Denied for Failure to Obey Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/5/17: Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2017. (Hellings, J)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/04/2017. (Flores, E)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE: Case Status signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TERMINATING AS MOOT 13 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER TO RESPOND to First Amended Petition Within Sixty (60) Days; and ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/22/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Respondent to File an Opposition OR Statement on Non-Opposition to Motion to Amend; ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/17. (Marrujo, C)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/16. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milan-Rodriguez v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Antonio Milan-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta E. Lynch
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?