Williams v. Bell et al

Plaintiff: John Wesley Williams
Defendant: C. Bell, S. Harrison, R. Fischer and Douglas
Case Number: 1:2016cv01584
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Lodging of Deposition Transcript, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/21/19. Responses Due In Ten Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/20/19. (Marrujo, C)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 74 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/19. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Regarding Production Of Document Submitted For In Camera Review And Issuance Of Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/5/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING 73 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/2019. (Jessen, A)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's 71 Motion for an Order to Return his case file exhibits be Denied re ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/19. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Compel, and Granting Requests to Extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/27/2018. Discovery deadline by 2/11/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/12/2019. Thirty Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 57 Request for Court Order Directing Defendants to Stop Delaying the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's October 5, 2018, Motion on or Before November 9, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/18. (Case Management Deadline: 11/9/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 55 Objections to Defendants' Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/13/18. (Gonzalez, R)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that Inmate John Wesley Williams, CDCR #V-34099 is no Longer Needed as a Participant in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/18/2018. (Flores, E)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 45 48 Motion for Imposition of Sanctions Against Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/17/2018. (Flores, E)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING 43 Motion to Attend Settlement Conference by video, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/22/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate: John Wesley Williams, CDCR# V-34099 on July 18, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. at United States District Court, Fresno, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/18/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING CASE for 120 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/3/2018. Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations 30 , denying Defendants' Motion to declare Plaintiff a vexatious litigant 19 and denying Plaintiff's Motion to strike a reply as unnecessary 29 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/16/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 19 Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/27/17. (Hellings, J)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 10 , 16 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/17. (Hellings, J)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 10 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/10/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S 10 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND/OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/30/2017. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wesley Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?