Duncan v. Equifax Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Ralph O Duncan
Defendant: Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union
Case Number: 1:2016cv01633
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed for plaintiffs' failure to prosecute this action, to appear, and comply with the Court's order of 1/30/2017. Matter referred to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, with objections to these findings due within fourteen days of service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/6/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Failure to Appear. The Court orders plaintiffs to file a written response to this Order to Show Cause indicating whether they intend to participate in this action and to explain their failure to appear at the initial scheduling conference, with said response due by 2/15/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/30/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. Lead Case: 1:16-cv-01633-AWI-EPG. Member Case: 1:16-cv-01637-AWI-EPG. MEMBER CASE CLOSED. All future filings shall be made in the lead case. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding consolidation. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/7/2016. (Rooney, M)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER DISMISSING Trans Union with Prejudice and STRIKING Prior 13 Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/30/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING Trans Union with Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/29/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Equifax Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph O Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union
Represented By: Kurtis Jeffery Anders
Represented By: Eileen T Booth
Represented By: Katherine Carlton Robinson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?