Sauceda, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Debra Sauceda and Isidro Sauceda
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Swanson Fahrney Ford Sales
Case Number: 1:2016cv01635
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/18/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Accordingly, the Court HEREBY ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order why dispositive documents have not yet been filed. Plaintiff is forewarned that the failure to show cause may result in the imposition of sanctions, including the dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING DATES and Requiring Parties to File Dispositive Documents Within Sixty (60) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 3/21/2017 to 4/25/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT (ECF No. 16): It is hereby ordered that Defendant Swanson Fahrney Ford Sales shall file a response to the complaint on or before January 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/2016. (Valdez, E)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Swanson Fahrney Ford Sales shall file a response to the complaint on or before December 28, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauceda, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Sauceda
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Le Pere
Represented By: Hallen D. Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidro Sauceda
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Le Pere
Represented By: Hallen D. Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swanson Fahrney Ford Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?