Johnson et al v. City of Atwater et al
Plaintiff: Richard Dean Johnson and Lori Johnson
Defendant: City of Atwater, Frank Pietro, Samuel Joseph, David Walker, Don Wisdom, Robert Vargas, Dayton Snyder, Ken Lee, Fabian Velasquez, Adolfo Morales, Tyna Lamison and John Smothers
Case Number: 1:2016cv01636
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT dated *1/31/2019* in favor of Defendant Fabian Velazquez. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND PROPOSED VOIR DIRE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/28/2019. (Kusamura, W)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ON PARTIES MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/22/2019. Motion in Limine 81 -GRANTED; Motion in Limine 82 -DENIED; Motion in Limine 85 - DENIED.(Gonzales, V)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER. The parties shall jointly inform the Court, by December 21, 2018, 2:00p.m., of any issues previously identified as "disputed evidentiary issues" that are no longer in dispute because the propounding party no lon ger intends to rely upon this evidence at trial. For any previously-identified "disputed evidentiary issues" that a party still intends to rely upon at trial, the opposing party will submit a motion in limine (with corresponding points and authorities) to the Court by December 28, 2018, with opposition from the propounding party due January 4, 2019 and any opposition reply due January 9, 2019. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/18/2018. (Timken, A)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING 72 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement agreement and for attorney's fees and costs. Plaintiffs' motion to enforce the settlement agreement (Doc. No. 66) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs in the amount of $2,000 for enforcing the settlement (Doc. No. 66) is DENIED. Within ten days of service of this order, the parties shall: a) Meet and confer on potential dates for a pretrial conference and for trial; and b) Contact courtroom deputy Alice Timken to schedule the same. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/4/2018. (Timken, A)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiffs motion to enforce the settlement agreement should be DENIED; re 66 MOTION to ENFORCE JUDGMENT ; Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs in the amount of $2,000 for enforcing the settlement should be DENIED; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/16/2018. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT TO MAGISTRATE,VACATING HEARING DATES, AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/17/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DATES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: In order to allow more time for the parties to address settlement, the current trial date of March 20, 2018, as we ll as all associated pre-trial dates described in the pre-trial order (Feb 20, Feb 28, Mar 5, Mar 8, Mar 14 and Mar 15, see ECF. No. 48) are VACATED.; A settlement conference is scheduled before United States Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on Tuesday, March 27, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM). The parties shall submit confidential settlement statements directly to Judge McAuliffes chambers by e-mail to BAMOrders@caed.uscourts.gov at least one (1) week prior to the settlement conference. The parties shall conform their settlement conference statements and attendance at the settlement conference consistent with the Courts January 13, 2017 scheduling order (ECF No. 9); and A status conference is set before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on April 16, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2 (AWI). This conference may be held telephonically at the option of the parties. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/16/2018. (Hernandez, M)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER on Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/2018. (Kusamura, W)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Dispositive Motions amended to be filed by 11/29/2017; Pretrial Conference to be heard on 2/8/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. All other aspects of the January 13, 2017 scheduling order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/6/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION REQUESTING MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER AS TO FILING DATE OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/4/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. OBJECTIONS DUE WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/2017(Hernandez, M)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Referring Pending 19 Motion to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; April 17, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. VACATED, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/21/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISCHARGING 13 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE why First Amended Complaint Should not be Stricken from the Record signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/01/2017. (Flores, E)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for July 6, 2017 at 9:30 am before Judge McAuliffe). PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/8/2017. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. City of Atwater et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dean Johnson
Represented By: Kerry Margason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Johnson
Represented By: Kerry Margason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Atwater
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Pietro
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Joseph
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walker
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Wisdom
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vargas
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton Snyder
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Lee
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Velasquez
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Morales
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyna Lamison
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smothers
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Gary Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?