Ashely v. Youngblood et al
Plaintiff: Mark Ashely
Defendant: Donny Youngblood, Mick Gleason, Zack Scrivner, Mike Maggard, David Couch, Leticia Perez, Jordan Kauffman, Mary B Bedard and County of Kern
Case Number: 1:2016cv01638
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 101 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/4/2021. (Hall, S)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/24/2020. (Hall, S)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 95 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2019. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 3/6/2020; Expert 5/29/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/12/2020; He aring by 7/10/2020. Dispositive Motion and Motion to Certify Deadlines: Filed by 7/24/2020; Hearing by 8/31/2020. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 12/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 79 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/1/2019. (Hall, S)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re Motion for Temporary Injunctive Order 79 and ORDER PROHIBITING MEETINGS on January 18 and 19, 2019 with Prospective Members of the Class, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/2019. Opposition to motion due by 1/23/2019; optional reply due by 1/28/2019. Motion hearing SET for 2/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and ORDER 75 Amending Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/14/2018. Notice and Consent Forms mailed by 11/30/2018; opt-in Consent Forms due by 2/28/2019. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 11/8/2019; Exper t 1/6/2020. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/17/2020; Hearing by 2/18/2020. Dispositive Motion De adlines: Filed by 2/25/2020; Hearing by 4/6/2020. Pretrial Conference continued to 5/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial continued to 8/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISCHARGING 71 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2018. (Hall, S)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER to PLAINTIFF to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for His Failure to Secure Substitute/Additional Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/10/2018. Show Cause Response due within 10 days. (Hall, S)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER 69 Amending the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2018. New counsel for plaintiff shall file notice of appearance or substitution of attorney by 7/9/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Non-exp ert 5/2/2019; Expert 6/28/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/11/2019; Hearing by 8/9/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/9/2019; Hearing by 9/16/2019. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 1/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Final Approval of the Notice of Eligibility to Participate in a Collective Action and Consent Form, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2018. The Court ORDERS: (1) Final approval of the "Notice of Eligibility to Participate in a Collective Action" and proposed Consent Form is GRANTED; and (2) The Notice and Consent Form SHALL be mailed to potential opt-in plaintiffs no later than May 25, 2018. (Valdez, E)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL of the Notice of Eligibility to Participate in a Collective Action and Consent Form; ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to File a Finalized Notice and Consent Form, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/17/2018. (Hall, S)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER 58 Amending Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/8/2018. Notice of Potential Opt-in: Stipulated notice due by 1/16/2018; Notice Given by 2/6/2018; Consent by 4/22/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference CONTINUED to 4/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 56 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2017. Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures due by 10/2/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 11/3/2017. Stipulated Notice of Potential Opt-in Plaintiffs due by 10/6/2017. (Hall, S)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/23/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/20/2017. Notice and Opt-in Deadlines: Stipulated Notice 9/22/2017; Mailing 10/6/2017; Opt-in 12/20/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disc losures 9/8/2017; Non-Expert 8/31/2018; Expert 10/26/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/9/201 8; Hearing by 12/7/2018. Certification/Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/17/2018; Hearing by 1/28/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Hall, S)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART 32 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/2017. (Hall, S)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 32 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2017. (Hall, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 33 Stipulation to Continue the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/2/2017. Motion Hearing CONTINUED to 6/19/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 3/15/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER 25 to Continue the Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 3/1/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/29/2016 discharging 19 Order to Show Cause and relating and reassigning cases; new case number 1:16-cv-01638-LJO-JLT. (Lundstrom, T)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Actions Should Not Be Related and/or Consolidated, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/7/2016. Show Cause Response due by 12/28/2016. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashely v. Youngblood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Gleason
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Scrivner
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Maggard
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Couch
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Perez
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Kauffman
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary B Bedard
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Nathan Wade Austin
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cepideh Roufougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ashely
Represented By: Gregory Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?