Verragio, Ltd. v. Malakan Diamond Co.
Plaintiff: Verragio, Ltd.
Defendant: Malakan Diamond Co.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01647
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CONSENT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION Against Malakan Diamond Co.; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/16/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES FOR SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND CONSENT DECREE. The Parties are ORDERED to complete written settlement documentation and submit such documentation to the Court by May 15, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/19/2018. (Timken, A)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. The Settlement Conference currently set for 3/20/2018, is CONTINUED to 3/27/2018, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/23/2018. (Timken, A)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/31/2018. (Timken, A)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and ORDER to VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Settlement Conference currently set for 10/19/2017, is CONTINUED to 3/20/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/4/2017. (Timken, A)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/23/2017. (Timken, A)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DISMISSING Cross-Defendant AE Jewelers of Appleton, LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/8/17. (Hellings, J)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER on STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/21/2017. (Timken, A)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/12/2017. (Defendant Malakan Diamond's summary judgment motion is denied as premature and plaintiff's request for leave to conduct discovery is granted. The hearing re the same set 5/16/2017 is VACATED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/27/2017, is CONTINUED to 7/13/2017, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 7/6/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/2017. (Timken, A)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING Cross-Claim Defendant Jensen Jewlers of Idaho, LLC with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Cross-Defendants Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/28/17: The Clerk of the Court is directed to TERMINATE Cross-Defendants Jensen Jewelers of Idaho, LLC, Harold Jaffe Jewelry, Inc., and AE Jewelers, Inc. (Hellings, J)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Crossclaim Between Malakan Diamond Co. and Harold Jaffee Jewelry, Inc. Cross-defendant Harold Jaffe Jewelry, Inc.'s response to Crossclaimant Malakan Diamond Co.'s crossclaims shall be filed no later than April 3, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/21/2017. (Timken, A)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/7/2017, is CONTINUED to 4/27/2017, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 4/20/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/2/2017. (Timken, A)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Crossclaim Between Malakan Diamond Co. and Jensen Jewelers of Idaho, LLC. Cross-defendant Jensen Jewelers of Idaho, LLC's response to Crossclaimant Malakan Diamond Co.'s crossclaims shall be filed no later than March 20, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/1/2017. (Timken, A)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/7/2017, is CONTINUED to 4/7/2017, at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 3/31/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/27/2017. (Timken, A)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Approving Stipulation (Doc. 8) to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint: that Defendant has up to and including January 6, 2017 to respond to Plaintiffs initial Complaint. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2017. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verragio, Ltd. v. Malakan Diamond Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verragio, Ltd.
Represented By: Howard Alan Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malakan Diamond Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?