Villarreal et al v. Perfection Pet Foods, LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Villarreal, Agustin Benitez and Carlos Morales
Defendant: Perfection Pet Foods, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01661
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, document 14 , be granted; that the case be remanded for arbitration; and that the case be dismissed and closed. This matter is referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, with objections to the findings due within fourteen days of service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/10/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/7/2017 and CONTINUING it to 4/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Th e Court grants telephonic appearance to any party wishing to so appear and directing each party to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/30/2017. (Rooney, M)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 1/10/2017 for the filing of plaintiffs' first amended complaint, with any responsive pleading due by 1/24/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/12/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villarreal et al v. Perfection Pet Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Villarreal
Represented By: Walter L Haines
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Benitez
Represented By: Walter L Haines
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Morales
Represented By: Walter L Haines
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfection Pet Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?