Gaines v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Gaines
Defendant: E. G. Brown, S. Kernon, S. Lwin, Zaragoza, King, Jackson, Ray, R. Mitchell, Suede, K. Miller and T. Boswell
Case Number: 1:2016cv01666
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/4/2021. (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING 88 Findings and Recommendations and ORDER DENYING 60 Defendants' Motion for an Order Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/2/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fifth 85 Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Pose Security; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 60 Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/6/2020. (Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS). (Marrujo, C)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ACCEPTING Attorney Christine Starkie's Untimely Written 77 Response Clarifying Role in Instant Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/17/2020. (Marrujo, C)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Requiring Attorney Christine Starkie to File Written Response Clarifying Role in Instant Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/12/2020. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without Prejudice; ORDER 66 67 69 STRIKING Improperly Filed Documents; ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security; ORDER GRANTING 70 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/07/2020. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying 61 Motion to Proceed IFP as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/22/2019. (Flores, E)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that Inmate Mary Lee Gaines is no Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/28/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Mary Lee Gaines, CDC# WA-2486 re 53 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/6/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Mary Lee Gaines, CDC# WA-2486, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/1/19. (Marrujo, C)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/18. ( Settlement Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.) (Marrujo, C)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Court to Reissue March 9, 2018 Order Finding Service of First Amended Complaint; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Send March 9, 2018 Order to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/27/2018. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 38 Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/2018. (Filing Deadline: 8/21/2018). (Lundstrom, T)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Submit Service Documents or SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Striking Objections to Findings and Recommendations as Duplicative signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/16/2018. (Flores, E)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Adopting 20 Findings and Recommendations Finding Cognizable Claims Against Defendants Mirelez and Hoehing and recommending Dismissal of all Other Claims and Defendants, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/6/18. Jackson, S. Kernon, King, S. Lwin, K. Miller, R. Mitchell, Ray, Suede, Zaragoza, T. Boswell and E. G. Brown terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FINDING Cognizable Claims Against Defendants Mirelez and Hoehing; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of all other Claims and Defendants; Thirty-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 12/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2017 vacating 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Lundstrom, T)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/14/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 10/2/2017.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Boswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?