Gallo Cattle Company v. Saputo Dairy Foods USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Gallo Cattle Company
Defendant: Saputo Dairy Foods USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01673
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close Case; Parties filed a Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/15/17. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Stipulation and Order to amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/2017. (Non Expert Discovery due by 10/16/2017: Expert Disclosure due by 10/20/2017: Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 11/6/2017; Expert Discovery due by 11/17/2017) (Rosales, O)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines: Non-Expert Discovery deadline is September 15, 2017; Expert Disclosure deadline is September 27, 2017; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline is October 20, 2017; and the Expert Discovery deadline is extended to November 9, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines and hearings: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Non-Exp ert Discovery due by 8/16/2017; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/6/2017; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/6/2017; Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2017; with all other dates to remain the same. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/9/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallo Cattle Company v. Saputo Dairy Foods USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saputo Dairy Foods USA, LLC
Represented By: Marc R. Lewis
Represented By: Paul T. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gallo Cattle Company
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Nicholson
Represented By: Shane Garrett Smith
Represented By: Marshall Craig Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?