Hopson v. Walgreens Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Defendant: Gurmukh S Gill, Sahota Pardeep and Walgreens Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv01678
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/20/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION Regarding Continuance of Pretrial Scheduling Conference and ORDER Granting Thereof signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/14/2017: It is hereby ordered, that the Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 3/20/2017, at 9:30 am until 5/22/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Valdez, E)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to continue the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/9/2017 and CONTINUING it to 3/20/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Telephoni c appearances are granted at said conference, with each party directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/2/2017. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Walgreens Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Malakauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurmukh S Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahota Pardeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?