Mundo v. Carmona et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan W. Mundo
Defendant: Hector Carmona, K. Cribbs, Archuleta and Bonffil
Case Number: 1:2016cv01687
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/6/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment ; ORDER DIRECTING Magistrate Judge to Schedule Evidentiary Hearing on Exhaustion Issues, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/23/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Compel Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/27/2018. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Denying 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/13/2018. Objections to F&R due by 3/12/2018. (Flores, E)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 38 Motion for Extension of Time; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/25/2018. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen Days. (Sant Agata, S)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/19/17. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Motion to Appoint Counsel 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/5/17: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 17 Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss Non-Cognizable Claims and Defendants; Clerk to Terminate Defendants Campa and Cribbs, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/14/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Extend Time to File First Amended Complaint; ORDER Granting Motion for Copy of the Complaint; Clerk to Resend ECF Nos. 1 & 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/9/17. Amended Complaint Due Within Sixty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mundo v. Carmona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan W. Mundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Carmona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Cribbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonffil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?