Bryant v. U.S. Bank et al
Plaintiff: Mary J. Bryant
Defendant: U.S. Bank, Buckley Madole, N.B.S. Default Services and Bloom Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01688
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/12/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 COPY of ORDER Filed in 1:17-cv-01218-DAD-BAM re 10 Motion, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Case Should be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Comply with a Court Order, 6 . Matter referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/3/2017. (Timken, A)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY THE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed for her failure comply with the Court's June 13, 2017 Order by not filing a second amended complaint within the specified period of time. The Court further CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if she fails to file this statement within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this Order, the Court will recommend to the presiding district court judge that this action be dismissed, in its entirety. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/5/2017. (Timken, A)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH 14 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this order, the Court will recommend that in forma pauperis status be denied and the first amended complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/12/2017. (Timken, A)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order dismissing 1 Complaint with leave to amend, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/15/2016. Amended Complaint due by 12/7/2016. (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. U.S. Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary J. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckley Madole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.B.S. Default Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloom Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?