Gaines v. Virk et al
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Gaines
Defendant: P. Virk, Seretona, Hoehing, R. Ybarra, S. Lwin, Edward, Ray, Voltz, Martinez and J. Rhodes
Case Number: 1:2016cv01689
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING 69 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 55 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/21/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant 55 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust re 24 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Rivera, O)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING 63 Defendants' Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/13/2020. (Rivera, O)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 61 Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to 55 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/14/2020. Opposition due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 59 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/15/2020. ( Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING 45 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Defendant's 42 Motion Order Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/04/2020. (Orozco, A)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to DENY Defendant's 42 Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security, filed by Correctional Officer Beaver; Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/10/2019. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 43 Motion to Stay Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/12/2019. (Orozco, A)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2019. (Flores, E)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motions to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause Nunc Pro Tunc and Discharging 28 Order to Show Cause; Clerk to Forward Service Documents to U.S. Marshal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/19. (Gonzalez, R)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and to Prosecute this Action; Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/9/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; ORDERED to Re-Serve Plaintiff a copy of the order directing Plaintiff to submit service documents 25 and to remove Ms. Huang from the docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/6/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for a Limited Purpose signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With the Court's Order and to Prosecute This Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/30/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Virk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Virk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seretona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoehing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?