Martin et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kathy M. Martin and Danny Martin
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv01703
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/4/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents by May 4, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2018. (Jessen, A)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING MARCH 16, 2018 HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/5/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Dismissing Danny Martin's Loss of Consortium Claim and Directing Clerk of Court Terminate Plaintiff Danny Martin From the Docket signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2018. Exhibits due by 3/27/2018. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR SEVEN-DAY EXTENSION OF NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the non-expert discovery deadline is extended seven (7) days to August 25, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Reassigning Case; new case number is 1:16-cv-1703 SAB, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/10/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy M. Martin
Represented By: Edward Baxter Chatoian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Martin
Represented By: Edward Baxter Chatoian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?