Mohamed et al v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: Ebtisam Ali Mohamed and Jamal Saleh Almuharrak
Defendant: Loretta Lynch, Robert Godec, US Department of State and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2016cv01735
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/18/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FIFTH JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER re: EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before October 3, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/8/2017. (Timken, A)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 THIRD JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER re EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendants are granted a 30-day extension of time for filing a response to the Complaint (Doc. 1). Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before July 21, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/21/2017. (Timken, A)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Extension of Time. Defendants are granted a 90-day extension of time for filing a response to the Complaint (Doc. 1). Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before May 22, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/21/2017. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed et al v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Godec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebtisam Ali Mohamed
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Saleh Almuharrak
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?