Asberry v. Biter

Plaintiff: Tony Asberry
Defendant: Biter
Case Number: 1:2016cv01741
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER ADOPTING 157 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 133 & 136 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; and ORDER DENYING 134 Plaintiff's Motion for Access to Law Library and 154 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/3/2019. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That Court Deny Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/6/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/5/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Adopting 148 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to (1) GRANT Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; (2) Allow Plaintiff to Proceed only on Cognizable Claims; and (3) DENY Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING 110 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/2/2018. (Jessen, A)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to (1) Grant Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; (2) Allow Plaintiff to Proceed on Only Cognizable Claims; (3) Deny Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/30/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's First 91 Motion to Compel and Requiring Defendants Ferris and Godfrey to Supplement their Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel 110 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/2/18. Deadline: 08/17/18. (Gonzalez, R)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING 74 Motion to Compel and 86 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/15/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 105 Motion for separate Deposition hearings signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Adopting 82 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Various 67 71 75 Motions for Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/21/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Adopting 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Plaintiff's 44 46 Motions signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/20/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: (1) DENY 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Include Previous Lawsuits; and (2) DENY Without Prejudice 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/29/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING 75 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Appointment of Legal Assistant, and Additional Time to Reply to Interrogatories; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to (1) Deny 67 Motion to Access Law Library; (2) Deny 71 Motion for Court Order to Provide Plaintiff Access to Legal Files; and (3) Deny 75 Motion for Access to Medical Files; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/27/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying Motions for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Court Orders 20 , 24 , 42 , 59 , 62 , 64 , 68 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/2/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING Request for Clarification; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Motion to Have Meaningful Access to Court; Clerk to Send Copy of this Order to Litigation Coordinator at Plaintiff's Institution; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/19/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING Request for Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendants Lozovoy and Relevante signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DECLINING to Impose Sanctions on Counsel for Defendants Lozovoy and Relevante signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Requiring Counsel for Defendants Lozovoy and Relevante to File Declaration Explaining Apparent Delay Within Ten (10) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/19/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for Action to Proceed Only on Cognizable Claims and that all other claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/05/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Return Extra Summons to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/13/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/28/2017 recommending that this action proceed only on cognizable claims and that all other claims and defendants be dismissed re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/23/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 10 Motion to the court for proof of exhaustion signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asberry v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Asberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?