Elliott v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Andrew Elliott
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01763
Filed: November 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/01/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a written response to this order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failu re to prosecute within seven (7) days of the date of service of this order. Failure to comply with this order to show cause shall result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE Stipulation for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/17/2017. (Flores, E)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Andrew Elliott
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Urmila R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?