Ramirez v. Nazareno
Plaintiff: Theresa Mary Ramirez
Defendant: J. Nazareno
Case Number: 1:2016cv01772
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 12 Second Motion to request refund of filing fee signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/6/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Request Refund of Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close the Case re 8 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Nazareno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Mary Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nazareno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?