Oushana, et al. v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Nora Oushana and Scarlet Karamian
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's HIW, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01782
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Entering Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/14/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS to March 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/6/2018. (Hernandez, M)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO WAIVE PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF REPRESENTATIVE AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/20/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 31 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 23 Designation of Counsel for Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/28/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, documents 12 , 13 , 14 , 15 , 16 , 18 , 19 , and 20 as follows: 1. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, filed March 10, 2017, is GRANTED as follows: A. Pla intiff Oushana and Karamian may include in the amended complaint claims for general negligence, products liability (negligence liability), products liability (strict liability), and fraud claims based on concealment / omission as set forth in the pro posed second amended complaint (Doc. 12-2); B. Plaintiff Oushana may include in the amended complaint a claim for breach of implied warranty of fitness; 2. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is DENIED as follows: A. Plaintiffs may not file claims for fraud based on false representation; 3. If Plaintiffs choose to file a second amended complaint adding their new causes of action, Defendants are entitled to depose Plaintiff Oushana a second time at her expense; 4. If Plaintiffs still seek to file a second amended complaint, they shall file a second amended complaint within ten (10) days of the date of service of this order; and 5. Defendants shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date Plaintiffs file the second amended complaint to file a responsive pleading. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/5/2017. (Rooney, M)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 12 RECOMMENDING GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Objections due within 14 days. The matter is referred to Judge Ishii. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Clerk of the Court to terminate Electrolux North America, Inc. and Electrolux Home Products, Inc. as parties in this action 6 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/22/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oushana, et al. v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Oushana
Represented By: Naresh Channaveerappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlet Karamian
Represented By: Naresh Channaveerappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Charles D. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?