Fajardo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Belen Mary Fajardo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01784
Filed: November 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER AWARDING fees and costs in the amount of $6,000 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. §§ 2412(d) and 1920 subject, to the terms of the Stipulation. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/16/2018. (Rooney, M)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/9/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 9/8/2017 for the filing of defendant's response to plaintiff's opening brief. All subsequent filing deadlines are extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/10/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING leave for Defendant to file a Supplemental Certified Administrative Record. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/5/2017. (Rooney, M)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/29/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fajardo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belen Mary Fajardo
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Scott J. Borrowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?