Gonzales v. Ferrso, et al.
Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Defendant: Ferrso, Tiserina, Garcia, B. Zavala, Brosman, Herrick, Escalante, Franlkin Rodriguez, Tacara and Davis
Case Number: 1:2016cv01813
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending granting Summary Judgment in favor of Defendants 58 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/29/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 1/3/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff a Copy of the Instant Motion and his Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/12/2018. (Flores, E)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time 46 and denying Motions for Settlement Conference 41 , 47 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/8/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING 40 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING In Part 25 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/29/18. (Marrujo, C)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that 25 MOTION to DISMISS be granted in part and denied in part signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/29/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Directing Response from Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/29/2017. (Flores, E)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Ex Parte 22 Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/5/17. Responsive Pleading Due by 7/5/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/16/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Ferrso, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferrso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiserina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escalante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franlkin Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?