Lindholm v. The Home Depot, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dani Lindholm
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc. and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01821
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. signed by District Judge Donald W Molloy on 09/11/2017. (Ethridge, D)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING: Mandatory Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/20/2017 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Donald W Molloy. signed by District Judge Donald W Molloy on 06/08/2017. (Ethridge, D)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - No claim shall be made for mental and/or emotional distress over and above that usually associated with the physical injuries claimed; and,2. No expert testimony regarding the aforementioned mental and emotional distress shall be presented at Trial in support of such claim for emotional distress damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindholm v. The Home Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dani Lindholm
Represented By: Barbara Jeanne Rueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm D. Schick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm D. Schick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?