Clear Recon Corp. v. All Claimants to Surplus Funds
Defendant: All Claimants to Surplus Funds After a Trustee's Sale of the Real Property Located at 9903 Cheyenne Drive, Bakersfield, CA 93312
Petitioner: Clear Recon Corp.
Respondent: United States
Case Number: 1:2016cv01837
Filed: December 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Closing the Case as to Rachel Rodriguez Only 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/31/2017. (Hall, S)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISCHARGE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/20/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER to Rachael Rodriguez to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Her Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2017. Show Cause Response due by 7/21/2017. (Hall, S)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/3/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 6/2/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 3/9/2017; Non-Expert 9/1/2017; Expert 10/30/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/23/2017 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive and Dispositive Motion Deadline: Filed by 1/12/2018. Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 6/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Recon Corp. v. All Claimants to Surplus Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clear Recon Corp.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States
Represented By: Jonathan Hauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Claimants to Surplus Funds After a Trustee's Sale of the Real Property Located at 9903 Cheyenne Drive, Bakersfield, CA 93312
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?