July 10, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and VACATING JULY 11, 2018 HEARING, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/18. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
|
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
48
ORDER GRANTING In Part and Denying Plaintiff's Request to Seal Billing Records, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
|
June 11, 2018 |
Filing
46
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE BILLING RECORDS IN PUBLIC RECORD OR FILE REQUEST TO SEAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before June 15, 2018, Plaintiffs shall either: Submit a request to seal the billing records that is in compliance with Local Rule 141; or File the billing records in the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/11/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 28, 2018 |
Filing
44
ORDER re STIPULATION to Continue deadline for filing Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and hearing date; Motion Hearing currently set for 6/20/2018 is continued to 7/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2018. (Kusamura, W)
|
February 23, 2018 |
Filing
42
ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (ECF Nos. 30 , 35 , 40 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2018. The parties shall file any motions in support of final approval of the settlement no later than May 21, 2018. Final Fairness Hearing set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Valdez, E)
|
February 20, 2018 |
Filing
41
ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 21, 2018 HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 10, 2018 |
Filing
34
STIPULATION and ORDER TO RESET THE MOTION HEARING as to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval be continued from 1/17/2018 to 1/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 13, 2017 |
Filing
32
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT TO JANUARY 17, 2018. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The hearing on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement is CONTINUED to January 17, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9; and Plaintiff shall submit supplemental briefing on or before January 10, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/13/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|
November 17, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER re Stipulation Re Extending Deadline for Motion re Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2017. Deadline for filing the Motion for Conditional Judicial Approval is continued from November 17, 2017 to November 22, 2017. (Valdez, E)
|
October 12, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER FOLLOWING JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING MEDIATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: All pending dates and matters in this action are vacated; The parties shall file a motion for conditional judicial approval of settlement o n or before November 17, 2017; and A hearing on the motion for tentative judicial approval of settlement is set before the undersigned on December 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|
June 9, 2017 |
Filing
24
ORDER RE STIPULATION CONCERNING DISCOVERY, STAY OF THE ACTION, AND MEDIATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that subject to the conditions set forth in this Order, this matter is STAYED until October 16, 2017. The parties shall advise the Court as to the status of this matter by filing a joint status report on or before October 12, 2017. If the matter is resolved, the parties shall file a notice of settlement. (Thorp, J)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint supplemental briefing on or before June 12, 2017, addressing whether the mailing of the notice in only English will be sufficient to provide notice to the potential class members and give the potential class members an opportunity to opt out of disclosure of their information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
21
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/2017. (Jessen, A)
|
April 24, 2017 |
Filing
19
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO VACATE OR CONTINUE DEADLINES FOR A MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION. The deadline for filing a motion for conditional certification shall be extended to October 16, 2017; The deadline for filing an opposition to a motion for conditional certification shall be extended to November 13, 2017; The hearing on a motion for conditional certification shall be set pursuant to the Local Rules; and Pursuant to the parties stipulation, the statute of limitations for any individu al who opts into any collection action approved by the Court is tolled for the period from June 1, 2017, until sixty (60) days after any order by the Court granting conditional certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing
17
ORDER RE INFORMAL TELECONFERENCE AND EXTENDING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION DEADLINES. The deadline for filing a motion for conditional certification shall be extended to April 28, 2017; and The deadline for filing an opposition to a motion for conditional certification shall be extended to May 19, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 14, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER Reassigning Case; new case number is 1:16-cv-1848-SAB, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/14/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
|