Cesar A. Betancourt v. New Century Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cesar A. Betancourt
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, Quality Loan Services Coporation and First American Title
Case Number: 1:2016cv01855
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint be Dismissed Without Leave to Amend for Failure to State a Claim, 12 . Matter referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/19/2018. (Timken, A)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/27/2017. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint With Leave to Amend Within Thirty Days. The Court DISMISSES the Amended Complaint, (Doc. 7 at 1), WITHOUT PREJUDICE and WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff may file a second am ended complaint, if he so chooses, by no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The Court CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he fails to file a timely second amended complaint in compliance with this Order, the Court will recommend that the presiding district court judge dismiss the Amended Complaint with prejudice and, as such, terminate this case. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/16/2017. (Timken, A)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/11/2017. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of RECUSAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/16. Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto for all further proceedings. The New Case Number is: 1:16-cv-01855-AWI-SKO, (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cesar A. Betancourt v. New Century Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar A. Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?