Snowden v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Snowden, Jr
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01859
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ; GRANTING 23 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER 42 U.S.C. §406(b), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/21/2020. (Apodaca, P)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Awarding Equal Access to Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/14/2018. (Valdez, E)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff James Snowden, Jr. and Against Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/16/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that Defendant has until October 18, 2017 to submit her response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/31/17. (Case Management Deadline: 10/18/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Snowden, Jr
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sundeep R. Patel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?