Zaiza v. Guthrie, et al.
Plaintiff: Jose Roberto Zaiza
Defendant: C Guthrie, B Resa, M DoCanto, T. Jordan, B. Weaver, J. Amaya, F Castaneda, W. Brodie, D. B. Hernandez and D Childress
Case Number: 1:2016cv01862
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum 33 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/9/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that Inmate Jose Roberto Zaiza, CDC #G-23177, is No Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the 34 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/5/2018. (Hall, S)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (1) DISCHARGING 31 Order to Show Cause; (2) DENYING Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Extension of Time; and (3) DENYING as MOOT 35 Request for a Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/20/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jose Roberto Zaiza, CDCR# G-23177 for Personal Appearance on October 5, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. at 510 19th Street signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/13/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Jose Roberto Zaiza, CDCR# G23177 to appear Telephonically October 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/11/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for his failure to follow the court's order and order granting Defendant's 30 Motion for Extension to file Pretrial Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/4/2018. Show Cause Response due by 9/19/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/18. Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Gonzalez, R)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER for Action to Proceed Only on Cognizable Claim and That All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/22/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/28/2017 recommending that this action proceed only on cognizable Eighth Amendment Claim and that all other claims and Defendants be dismissed re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaiza v. Guthrie, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Roberto Zaiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Resa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M DoCanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Castaneda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. B. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?