Baker v. German, et al.
Plaintiff: Dominique D. Baker
Defendant: Humberto German, Phillip Holguin, Phillip Kemph and Susan Hubbard
Case Number: 1:2016cv01873
Filed: December 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 39 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and 43 Defendants' Motion to Stay Ruling on the Motion be DENIED as Rendered Moot re 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/3/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER STRIKING 29 Third Amended Complaint; and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Re-Serve the June 14, 2017 Order and Re-Issue the Necessary Service of Process Documents for Completion and Return Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to Comply With a Court Order 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/17: 20-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING 19 Findings and Recommendations, Dismissing False Imprisonment Claim, and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Initiation of Service of Process, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/8/17. (Marrujo, C)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying, without Prejudice, Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Discovery as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/25/2017. (Flores, E)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Claim of Excessive Force Against Defendants Humberto German and Phillip Holguin and Dismissing Wrongful Imprisonment Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/28/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 13 Findings and Recommendation, and DENYING Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment, Without Prejudice, as Premature, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/20/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending that Plaintiff's 10 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be Denied, Without Prejudice, as Premature, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/17. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel for Lack of Signature signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. German, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Holguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Kemph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?