Beavers v. City of Turlock, et al.
Plaintiff: Randy Beavers
Defendant: City of Turlock, Gregory W. Roton, Dustin M. Ferreira, Gabriel Gonzalez and Paul Inderbitzen
Case Number: 1:2016cv01878
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER granting an extension to November 27, 2018, to file dispositional documents and/or a motion for attorney's fees and costs, as prescribed by the Court's Minute Order memorializing the parties' acceptance of the mediator's proposal (ECF No. [34)]. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2018. (Rooney, M)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 11/6/2018 to file dispositional documents and/or a motion for attorney's fees and costs. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/6/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Pretrial Motions Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/21/2018. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and for some cause shown, the pretrial motion filing deadline is extended from June 29, 2018, to July 19, 2018. The parties are cautioned that the delay in filing pretrial dispositive motions may result in those motions not being resolved prior to the pretrial conference in this action. The parties also are cautioned that further modifications of the scheduling conference order will not be granted absent a showing of good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). (Valdez, E)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER Denying Continuance in Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/10/2018. The parties' Stipulation and Proposed Order to continue the expert discovery, pretrial, and trial deadlines is DENIED IN PART. (Doc. 25 ). Nonetheless, in the interests of judicial economy, the Court will grant the parties some relief from the scheduling order as follows: (1) The Expert Disclosure deadline is CONTINUED to June 5, 2018; (2) The Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline is CONTINUED to June 26, 2018; (3) The Expert Discovery deadline is CONTINUED to July 17, 2018; (4) This extension of time to complete expert discovery does not alter the date of any other event or deadline already fixed by the Court's scheduling order. (Doc. 13 ). Accordingly, the pretrial motion filing deadline, and the dates for the pretrial conference and the trial remain as set forth in the April 17, 2017 scheduling order. (Doc. 13 ). (Valdez, E)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures and setting a Settlement Conference for 5/8/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/19/2018. (Rooney, M)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION re: Limited Extension Fact Discovery Deadline; ORDER: 1. The current fact discovery deadline be extended from February 16, 2018 to April 2, 2018 for the following: the deposition of Plaintiff, the deposition of Plaintiff's wife, Bren da Beavers, the deposition of witness Sanjay Prasad, and the deposition of any of Plaintiff's treating physicians, if those depositions go forward; 2. The February 16, 2018 deadline remains for all other fact discovery; 3. This extension of time to complete fact discovery does not alter the date of any event or deadline already fixed by the Courts scheduling order. (Doc. 13). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/9/2018. (Herman, H)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER for dismissal of certain allegations 20 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/4/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulation to permit Plaintiff first look at subpoenaed homeland security records, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2017. (Rosales, O)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE Order; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/2017. (Herman, H)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION re: STATUS CONFERENCE and ORDER. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for March 21, 2017, is CONTINUED to 4/13/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A Joint Scheduling Rep ort, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in CM/ECF on or before April 6, 2017, and shall be e-mailed in Word format to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The parties may appear telephonically for the scheduling conference with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number: 1-877-411-9749; passcode: 3190866. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/8/2017. (Thorp, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beavers v. City of Turlock, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Turlock
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Roton
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin M. Ferreira
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Gonzalez
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Inderbitzen
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Beavers
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Represented By: Sanjay Stephen Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?