Guru Ram Das Academy Inc. v. John Kerry
Plaintiff: Guru Ram Das Academy Inc.
Defendant: John Kerry
Case Number: 1:2016cv01906
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 34 , 35 , 37 , 38 , 39 , 40 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/27/17: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Rex Tillerson and James McCament and against Plaintiff Guru Ram Das Academy Inc. (Hellings, J)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AS UNNECESSARY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/11/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REASSIGNING Action to Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/16/17. New case number is 1:16-cv-01906-SAB. (Marrujo, C)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO SEAL THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT, and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/13/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND VACATING JULY 25, 2017 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The deadline for the parties to file motions is August 16, 2017; The deadline for combined cross-motions and oppositions is Septem ber 13, 2017; The deadline for reply briefs is October 4, 2017; The July 25, 2017 scheduling conference is vacated; and If the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge, they shall file consent forms on or before July 14, 2017. If the parties do not file consent forms on or before July 14, 2017, this action will proceed under the current judicial assignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/30/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/2017. Plaintiff's second amended complaint is deemed filed May 30, 2017. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading on or before June 16, 2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STRIKING 17 Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/17. (Marrujo, C)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE the Scheduling Conference from 5/9/2017 to 7/25/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (ECF Nos. 11 , 13 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/2/2017. It is hereby ordered that Defendants' motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading on or before May 1, 2017. (Valdez, E)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Request for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/01/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guru Ram Das Academy Inc. v. John Kerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kerry
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guru Ram Das Academy Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Sturman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?