G.1., et al. v. City Of Fresno, et al.
Plaintiff: A. G.1., A. G.2., A. G.3., A. G.4., R. A. G.J. and Alice Gonzalez
Defendant: City Of Fresno, City of Fresno Police Department and Zebulon Price
Case Number: 1:2016cv01914
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 6/30/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties may appear telephonically at the scheduling conference. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report or status report seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference setting forth any new dates not previously addressed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/2/2020. (Hernandez, M)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Following Informal Hearing on Discovery Dispute Regarding Defendants' Pending Petition in State Court for Juvenile Records, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/18. (Marrujo, C)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for Summary Judgment CASE CLOSED signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/21/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOLLOWING INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS OBJECTION TO AND ASSERTION OF PRIVILEGE FOR QUESTIONS DURING PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION AND REQUIRING MINORS TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION ON MAY 1, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/30/2018. (Hernandez, M)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE Stipulation for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/13/2017. (Flores, E)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 8 Petition of Amalia Alcantar for Appointment as Guardian Ad Litem for R.A.G.J. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/27/2016. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.1., et al. v. City Of Fresno, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. G.1.
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. G.2.
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. G.3.
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. G.4.
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. A. G.J.
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Gonzalez
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fresno Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zebulon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?