Michael Peralta vs Fresno County Police Officers
Plaintiff: Michael Peralta
Defendant: Fresno County Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2016cv01921
Filed: December 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing action for failure to prosecute and failure to state a claim; ORDER that Dismissal is subject to 28 U.S.C. 1915(G) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/4/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute and Failure to State a Claim re 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AMENDING Caption of 10 March 10, 2017 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2017. The caption is hereby amended to "Order Dismissing Complaint With Leave to Amend for Failure to State a Claim. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Peralta vs Fresno County Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?