Kenneth J. Baker v. World Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Baker
Defendant: World Savings Bank, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Wiess, LLP,
Case Number: 1:2016cv01943
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/1/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REDUCING SANCTION AMOUNT; NOTICE REGARDING FUTURE MISCONDUCT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 26, 2017. (Munoz, I)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Sanctioning Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to Rule 11 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/11/2017. (Flores, E)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 9 Motion to Remand; GRANTING Defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiff's Counsel signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/9/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for 3/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/6/2017. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth J. Baker v. World Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Baker
Represented By: Laleh Ensafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank
Represented By: Scott T Reigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Scott T Reigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Wiess, LLP,
Represented By: James T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?