Phillips v. Secretary of Navy
Plaintiff: Darryl Phillips
Defendant: Secretary of Navy
Case Number: 1:2016cv01944
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 91 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/26/19. (Marrujo, C)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 59 , 81 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/11/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Extension of Time and Denying Plaintiff's 76 Motion for Sanctions, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/20/2018. (1. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (Doc. No. 75) is grant ed; 2. Plaintiff' opposition to the motion to dismiss must now be filed and served by July 24, 2018; 3. Any reply by defendants in support of the pending motion to dismiss is due by July 31, 2018; 4. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Doc. No. 76) is denied; and 5. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return to plaintiff the attachments submitted in support of plaintiff's motion for sanctions.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Application to Continue the Secretary of the Army's Initial Response to the Third Amended Complaint, 70 . Defendant Secretary of the Army shall file his response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint no later than thirty (30) days after the Court's ruling on Defendant Secretary of the Navy's motion to dismiss (Doc. 59). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/29/2018. (Timken, A)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 60 Stipulation, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/9/2018. ( 59 Motion to Dismiss Hearing previously set for 4/17/2018, is CONTINUED to 8/7/2018, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. )(Gaumnitz, R)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER for (1) FILING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; and (3) CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff leave to file a Third Amended Complaint by no la ter than February 23, 2018. Defendant SHALL respond to the Third Amended Complaint by no later than March 23, 2018. The Scheduling Conference set for February 15, 2018, is hereby CONTINUED to May 3, 2018, at 10:15 A.M. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties SHALL file their joint scheduling report by no later than April 26, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/7/2018. (Timken, A)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Regarding Venue, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/20/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING Ex-Parte Application for Continuance. The deadline by which Plaintiff shall file his second amended complaint is extended to December 15, 2017, and Defendant shall file and serve a response in accordance with Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See Doc. 42, 2:9-10.) Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/16/2017. (Timken, A)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Second Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/27/2017. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying as Moot 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and 5 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/05/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Secretary of Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?