Germany v. Coelho, et al.
Plaintiff: Frankie L. Germany
Defendant: M. Coelho, Garcia Fernandez, Hanson and P. Ward
Case Number: 1:2017cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/5/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Opposition and Granting Extension of Time to File Further Objections to November 9, 2017 Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/06/2017. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 24 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/8/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 12/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 17, 2017, Order Denying his Request for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2017. (Flores, E)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing that Action Proceed Against Defendants Hanson, Coelho, Garcia-Fernandez, and Ward for Excessive Force in Violations of the Eighth Amendment and Dismissing all other Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/12/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germany v. Coelho, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie L. Germany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?